Financial history PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 212066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £15.12k £15.63k £15.78k £16.61k £17.25k
Total expenditure £5.71k £6.43k £16.75k £13.20k £11.66k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A