Trustees PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 212066
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SALLY BARRA Chair 11 January 2016
HALES AND SOME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JAMES STEEL Trustee 03 May 2020
HALES AND SOME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THORNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET BRENT Trustee 01 March 2020
HALES AND SOME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THORNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN MOORE Trustee 22 January 2018
HALES AND SOME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THORNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
SIMON LIMMER Trustee 05 December 2017
HALES AND SOME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THORNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev STEPHEN BATE Trustee 03 October 2016
HALES AND SOME EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THORNELL'S CHARITY
Received: On time