HINDOLVESTON TRUST

Charity number: 212159
Charity reporting is overdue by 28 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 28 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 13 December 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 03 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 21 July 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required