Trustees THE MARY KINROSS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity number: 212206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr NEIL EARL CROSS | Chair | 10 July 2002 |
|
|
||||
Alexander Sheridan Grant Shields | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henrietta Olivia Shields | Trustee | 18 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
MRS LIZZIE BARBER | Trustee | 20 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
GORDON RODNEY HAGUE | Trustee | 23 November 2010 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MARGARET ADAMS | Trustee | 31 October 1974 |
|
|||||
ELIZABETH JEAN SHIELDS | Trustee | 09 October 1969 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.