ST HILDA'S EAST

Charity number: 212208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.76m £1.70m £1.39m £1.60m £1.89m
Total expenditure £1.83m £1.85m £1.51m £1.74m £1.95m
Income from government contracts £1.16m £1.05m £563.86k £560.43k £603.34k
Income from government grants £7.96k £65.42k £40.28k £39.93k £59.46k
Income - Donations and legacies £135.70k £64.40k £57.33k £57.29k £90.08k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £119.40k £155.50k £169.43k £222.24k
Income - Charitable activities £1.50m £1.52m £1.17m £1.37m £1.57m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.82k £3.76k £3.07k £3.35k £3.45k
Income - Other £126.88k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £79.00k £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.79m £1.80m £1.44m £1.66m £1.85m
Expenditure - Raising funds £41.98k £53.97k £73.48k £76.76k £101.66k
Expenditure - Governance £14.30k £15.08k £14.32k £24.42k £14.53k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0