ST HILDA'S EAST

Charity number: 212208
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Malini McCauley Trustee 05 July 2018 None on record
JEAN LOCKER Trustee
FRIENDS OF ARNOLD CIRCUS Received: On time
Kate Simpson Trustee 01 June 2021 None on record
Harriet Edwards Trustee 16 January 2014 None on record
NANDINI BASUTHAKUR Trustee 07 January 2013 None on record
Petrina Austin Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
DENNIS TWOMEY Chair
LIMEHOUSE PROJECT LTD Received: On time
STEP FORWARD (TOWER HAMLETS) Received: On time
Amanda Warwick Trustee 30 March 2021 None on record
Fawziyah Rahman Trustee 28 November 2017 None on record
Mary Hadji-Michael Trustee 21 February 2020 None on record