HARVEIAN SOCIETY OF LONDON

Charity number: 212233
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 12 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 14 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2018 19 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2017 09 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 10 November 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required