Accounts and annual returns MARY WHARRIE TRUST

Charity number: 212267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2022 29 November 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 01 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 30 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 31 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2018 07 January 2020 129 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2018 Not Required