Financial history MARY WHARRIE TRUST

Charity number: 212267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022
Total gross income £7.33k £7.99k £6.57k £6.41k £8.10k
Total expenditure £5.36k £6.48k £7.73k £9.26k £5.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A