THE INLAND WATERWAYS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 212342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £1.56m £1.61m £1.94m £2.26m £1.41m
Total expenditure £1.44m £1.69m £1.69m £1.75m £1.72m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A £2.71k £2.68k
Income from government grants £0 £2.82k £2.82k £98.83k £123.08k
Income - Donations and legacies £778.25k £757.03k £885.61k £1.28m £630.09k
Income - Other trading activities £624.59k £676.96k £835.42k £760.60k £669.28k
Income - Charitable activities £114.96k £147.82k £191.56k £179.17k £66.37k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £38.02k £25.02k £31.22k £38.72k £44.17k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £362.28k £327.78k £480.30k £859.20k £160.98k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.00m £1.17m £1.07m £1.16m £918.70k
Expenditure - Raising funds £3.12k £9.87k £7.06k £17.92k £177.58k
Expenditure - Governance £121.82k £80.33k £93.76k £113.46k £78.32k
Expenditure - Grants institution £23.43k £23.23k £0 £0 £90.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £6.81k £5.09k £8.21k £8.96k
Expenditure - Other £439.68k £510.57k £621.66k £576.43k £626.91k