THE INLAND WATERWAYS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 212342
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Susan Claire O'Hare Trustee 03 October 2020 None on record
Hannah Sterritt Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
NICHOLAS DYBECK Trustee 03 October 2020
THE BRIAN LARGE BURSARY FUND Received: On time
Rt Hon Sir Robert James Atkins Trustee 03 April 2017 None on record
PAUL RODGERS Chair 30 September 2017 None on record
Alison Woodhams Trustee 03 October 2020 None on record
David Chapman Trustee 28 September 2019 None on record
Richard John Christopher Barnes Trustee 24 September 2016 None on record
Rebecca Hughes Trustee 25 September 2021 None on record
Dr Ian Christopher Redmond Sesnan Trustee 03 October 2020 None on record
John Butler Trustee 03 October 2020 None on record