THE TOM GALLON TRUST

Charity number: 212405
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.62k £5.08k £6.04k £3.81k £4.49k
Total expenditure £7.30k £6.11k £6.47k £6.39k £6.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A