CHARLES SUMMERS RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 212415
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 30 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 11 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 30 August 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required