HERTFORD POOR'S ESTATE

Charity number: 212421
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/04/2016 30/04/2017 30/04/2018 30/04/2019 30/04/2020
Total gross income £2.46k £1.78k £1.81k £1.85k £2.59k
Total expenditure £1.76k £1.87k £1.79k £1.79k £1.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A