Trustees RSA (THE ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF ARTS, MANUFACTURES AND COMMERCE)
Charity number: 212424

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
TIM EYLES | Chair | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Mx Claire Chou Doran | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Anthony Sheehan | Trustee | 14 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
David D'Souza | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Sandra Boss | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Dr HOSEIN KHAJEH-HOSSEINY | Trustee | 04 October 2022 |
|
|||||||
Ian Ailles | Trustee | 11 October 2021 |
|
|||||||
Sam Lewis | Trustee | 13 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Shaifali Puri | Trustee | 12 May 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JILL HUMPHREY | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
John Towers | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Charlotte Oades | Trustee | 08 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||
Andrea Kershaw | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.