ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LONDON SOUTH EAST BRANCH

Charity number: 212444
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020
Annual return 31 December 2019
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019
Annual return 31 December 2018
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018
Annual return 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1130 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1130 days
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download