Financial history FORNHAM ALL SAINTS CEMETERY TRUST

Charity number: 212499
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £11.63k £10.16k £13.18k £9.48k £11.12k
Total expenditure £1.26k £1.33k £1.91k £1.52k £1.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A