BARTS AND THE LONDON CHARITY AND RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 212563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 January 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 25 September 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 13 December 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 04 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 04 October 2016 On time Download