BARTS AND THE LONDON CHARITY AND RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 212563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Registration history:
  • 20 February 1997: Standard registration
  • 14 August 2014: Funds received from 288135 MULBERRY HEART ASSOCIATION
  • 08 September 2014: Funds received from 1102923 THE JAMES LOGAN TRUST FOR EDUCATION IN THE RECOGNI...
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-11 ACORN APPEAL FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-16 WHIPPS CROSS FLAMINGO APPEAL
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-2 PRIMARY AND COMMUNITY SERVICES GENERAL FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-3 CARDIAC RESEARCH FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-5 OSTEOPOROSIS AND RHEUMATOLOGY RESEARCH
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-6 ACUTE SERVICES GENERAL FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-7 MARGARET CENTRE
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-8 MENTAL HEALTH SERVICES GENERAL FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-9 E. N. T. EDUCATION AND RESEARCH FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-11 ACORN APPEAL FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-12 EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT FUND FOR CANCER
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-13 PRIMARY CARE TRUST GENERAL FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-14 CANCER PATIENT INFORMATION FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-15 WHIPPS CROSS RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT UNIT
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184-17 WHIPPS CROSS BIG PUSH APPEAL
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051184 WHIPPS CROSS UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS CHARITY
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-1 NEWHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST CHILDREN'S SE...
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-2 NEWHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST SKIN RESEARCH...
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-3 NEWHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARI...
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-4 NEWHAM GENERAL HOSPITAL GENERAL PURPOSE FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-6 NEWHAM CHEST CLINIC FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-7 TRUST PROPERTY ADMINISTERED IN CONNEXION WITH THE ...
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854-8 METROPOLITAN AND POPLAR HOSPITALS SAMARITAN FUND
  • 14 November 2014: Funds received from 1051854 NEWHAM UNIVERSITY HOSPITAL NHS TRUST GENERAL CHARI...
  • 16 December 2015: Funds received from 1050799 THE ASSOCIATION OF CARDIAC PATIENTS AND FRIENDS OF...
  • 29 September 2020: Funds received from 1173139 MY BODY BACK PROJECT CIO
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • BARTS CHARITY (Working name)
  • BARTS AND THE LONDON CHARITY TRUSTEE AND RELATED CHARITIES (Previous name)
  • ST BARTHOLOMEW'S AND THE ROYAL LONDON CHARITABLE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property