BARTS AND THE LONDON CHARITY AND RELATED CHARITIES

Charity number: 212563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Catherine Godson Trustee 01 October 2019 None on record
PAUL RAWLINSON Chair 03 February 2011 None on record
THOMAS ROUND Trustee 01 April 2016 None on record
Ian Hart Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Dr LORNA WILLIAMSON Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
Dr Richard Lewis Trustee 01 April 2019 None on record
Claire Brown Trustee 01 September 2020 None on record
VIJAY BHARADIA Trustee 01 October 2017 None on record
Dame Professor Parveen Kumar Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record
IAN PETERS Trustee 01 April 2017 None on record
SALLY FLANAGAN Trustee 28 September 2016 None on record
ANDREW BRUCE Trustee 01 April 2015 None on record
Professor David Rampton Trustee 01 October 2018 None on record