Accounts and annual returns THE GEORGE AND ESME POLLITZER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 212631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 01 February 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

01 February 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 13 February 2020 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 13 February 2020 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 13 December 2018 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2017 11 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 11 January 2018 On time Download Open in new window