Financial history THE GEORGE AND ESME POLLITZER CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity number: 212631
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2017 05/04/2018 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021
Total gross income £147.47k £161.13k £154.06k £140.60k £122.91k
Total expenditure £140.10k £167.26k £205.08k £114.43k £110.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A