FUEL ALLOTMENT

Charity number: 212682
Charity reporting is overdue by 941 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 210 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 04 May 2021 65 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 575 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 04 May 2021 430 days late Download
Annual return 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 941 days
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 941 days
Annual return 30 April 2017 11 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 06 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required