Accounts and annual returns HACKNEY BENEVOLENT PENSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 212731
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2022 21 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 12 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 26 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required