TOWN ESTATE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Makes grant towards upkeep of St. Mary's, Grundisburgh Parish Church Grants including loans to individuals residing in Grundisburgh
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Suffolk
Governance
- 07 January 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV CLARE SANDERS | Chair | 12 March 1996 |
|
|||||||
ROBERT ALFRED FLETCHER | Trustee | 30 September 2012 |
|
|||||||
JUDITH ANNE BIGNELL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.88k | £6.17k | £6.28k | £5.15k | £6.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.73k | £5.04k | £5.40k | £4.32k | £5.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 183 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 549 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 December 2021 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
GRANT - SEE P.R. 21 PAGE 515
Charitable objects
1. UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF PARISH CHURCH. 2. GIFTS IN KIND TO THE POOR.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GRUNDISBURGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Post Mill Gardens
Grundisburgh
WOODBRIDGE
Suffolk
IP13 6UP
- Phone:
- 01473 735 775
- Email:
- ROBERTFL1@EASTERNGREEN.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window