Accounts and annual returns ROYAL COLLEGE OF SURGEONS OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 212808
Charity reporting is overdue by 18 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Overdue by 18 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 24 March 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 24 March 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 29 June 2022 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 29 June 2022 60 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 29 April 2020 On time Download Open in new window