AMALGAMATED CHARITY OF KIDD RODDAM AND WEBB

Charity number: 212820
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £339 £324 £349 £357 £364
Total expenditure £300 £400 £400 £400 £400
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A