Financial history MISS E M HITCHCOCK

Charity number: 212846
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £21.48k £26.10k £32.78k £16.20k £17.06k
Total expenditure £50.67k £15.41k £57.27k £13.04k £16.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A £4.16k £3.42k N/A