THE WESTCROFT TRUST

Charity number: 212931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 06 April 2021 06 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2021 09 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2020 22 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2020 02 March 2021 24 days late Download
Annual return 06 April 2019 19 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2019 18 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2018 11 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2018 25 January 2019 On time Download
Annual return 06 April 2017 01 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 06 April 2017 22 December 2017 On time