THE WESTCROFT TRUST

Charity number: 212931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 06/04/2017 06/04/2018 06/04/2019 06/04/2020 06/04/2021
Total gross income £107.14k £104.26k £91.90k £75.33k £65.45k
Total expenditure £145.04k £152.02k £161.81k £139.77k £131.43k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A