SPENCER'S INDUSTRIAL ARTS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Coventry City
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 15 May 1963: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED ON 11TH SEPTEMBER 1888 AND C.C. SCHEME SEALED 19TH MAY 1939
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES DEEM BEST CALCULATED TO BENEFIT THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF COVENTRY. INCOME USED AT PRESENT TO ASSIST CANDIDATES, MALE OR FEMALE, TO COMPLETE THEIR EDUCATION AT UNIVERSITIES OR INSTITUTIONS OF UNIVERSITY RANK AT HOME OR ABROAD BY THE AWARD OF A SCHOLARSHIP.
Area of benefit
CITY OF COVENTRY
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window