THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY

Charity number: 212992
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Nigel Brunning Trustee 02 April 2020 None on record
Dr Sajid Hussain Trustee 03 April 2020 None on record
Capt Matthew Bolton RN Trustee 16 March 2017
WARSASH (NO. 636) UNIT OF THE SEA CADET CORPS Received: On time
Alan Mills Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
MARTIN MURPHY Trustee 27 March 2014
THE GUILD OF BENEVOLENCE OF THE INSTITUTE OF MARINE ENGINEERING, SCIENCE AND TECHNOLOGY Received: On time
RICHARD VIE Chair 31 May 2013 None on record
Philip Parvin Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record
Christopher Hodge Trustee 15 March 2021 None on record
Alastair Fischbacher Trustee 02 April 2020
THE SUSTAINABLE SHIPPING INITIATIVE LIMITED Received: On time
Parviz Sangin Trustee 02 April 2020 None on record
BARRY PHILIP STEWART BROOKS Trustee 16 March 2017 None on record
Kevin Daffey Trustee 14 March 2019 None on record
Dr Rachel Nicholls-Lee Trustee 25 April 2018 None on record
Dr Andrew Tyler CBE Trustee 15 March 2018 None on record