Accounts and annual returns MUTFORD WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 213026
Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 348 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Overdue by 348 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 27 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 08 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 26 July 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 09 July 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required