Financial history MUTFORD WELFARE TRUST

Charity number: 213026
Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £411 £364 £346 £318 £323
Total expenditure £293 £280 £249 £220 £148
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A