Financial history THE STRATFORD ST MARY COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 213046
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022
Total gross income £5.50k £6.97k £8.05k £7.93k £6.45k
Total expenditure £4.18k £1.82k £1.62k £1.09k £10.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A