THE DAYS' ALMHOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Maintenance of the Days Almshouses and welfare of the residents. Some financial support to the elderly of Sarratt Parish and provision of help and assistance to any member of the parish if needed.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,900 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 06 August 1990: Standard registration
- DAYS' ALMHOUSE CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Maria Coakley | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Biggerstaff | Trustee | 29 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Church | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dee Helen Gomm | Trustee | 02 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sue Ward | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Catharine Elliott | Trustee | 01 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Margaret Fern | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
CAROL JOY CHORLEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.35k | £16.14k | £16.28k | £16.28k | £17.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.65k | £6.98k | £8.15k | £41.72k | £19.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.00k | £1.70k | £1.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6 AUGUST 1990
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR PERSONS IN NEED. SUBJECT THERETO THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF SARRATT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF SARRATT
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Alexandra Road
Sarratt
RICKMANSWORTH
Hertfordshire
WD3 6AZ
- Phone:
- 01923265096
- Email:
- cjchorley@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window