BENGEO CHARITIES (ALSO KNOWN AS THE ALMSHOUSES INCLUDING THE DEEDS MEMORIAL ALMSHOUSES)

Charity number: 213092
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £7.04k £7.81k £7.92k £7.40k £7.40k
Total expenditure £2.35k £2.29k £2.29k £2.27k £24.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A