THE RED POLL CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 213132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 11 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 17 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 04 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 27 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 17 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 11 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 06 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 17 May 2016 On time Download