THE RED POLL CATTLE SOCIETY

Charity number: 213132
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

19 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
PETER GRINT Trustee 30 September 2011 None on record
Ms H R Arthan Trustee 21 April 2018
HEBRIDEAN SHEEP SOCIETY Received: On time
ELIZABETH GRINT Trustee 17 May 2013 None on record
Paul David Grainger Trustee 25 July 2020 None on record
ANTONY LESLIE BARRATT Trustee None on record
Jennifer Bellamy Trustee 25 July 2020 None on record
John Stuart Butler Trustee 21 April 2018 None on record
Anne-Marie Hamilton Trustee 25 July 2020 None on record
MARK MARTIN Trustee 11 October 2012
CHURCH LAWFORD READING ROOM Received: On time
Richard Stephen John Brookes Trustee 27 April 2019 None on record
JOHN RAYMOND WILLIAMS Chair
WATERS UPTON VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
SHAWBURY YOUNG FARMERS CLUB Received: On time
Andrew John Kirk Trustee 30 April 2016 None on record
SARA-ANNE GRIMWOOD Trustee 11 October 2012
SAXMUNDHAM SPORTS AND RECREATIONAL CLUB Received: 23 days late
SARAH BARNES Trustee 11 October 2012 None on record
Quentin Gwynne Edwards Trustee 27 April 2019 None on record
DAVID PHILLIP HUNT Trustee 09 May 2015 None on record
JOY BROUGHTON Trustee 11 October 2012 None on record
TERINA JOAN BOOKER Trustee 05 April 2014 None on record
Mrs CA Daw Trustee 21 April 2018 None on record