THE BRITISH AND IRISH CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 213148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 23 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 19 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 16 October 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 27 October 2016 On time Download