THE BRITISH AND IRISH CHURCHES TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 213148
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £719.88k £720.02k £720.55k £740.20k £1.21m
Total expenditure £719.88k £720.02k £720.55k £740.20k £1.21m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £713.04k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £720.02k £713.04k £734.39k £1.20m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £6.84k £0 £7.51k £5.81k £8.45k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £719.13k £720.02k £713.04k £734.39k £1.20m
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £750 £0 £720 £720 £780
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £7.51k £5.81k £8.45k