Financial history DEVON WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity number: 213224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.94m £5.24m £5.41m £5.50m £5.77m
Total expenditure £4.12m £4.17m £4.37m £4.52m £5.16m
Income from government contracts £35.39k £55.14k £45.34k £28.40k £95.89k
Income from government grants £466.49k £620.38k £743.70k £959.19k £1.02m
Income - Donations and legacies £1.57m £2.83m £2.15m £2.53m £2.50m
Income - Other trading activities £393.11k £301.67k £286.62k £350.95k £407.36k
Income - Charitable activities £1.96m £2.08m £2.95m £2.42m £2.78m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £23.84k £15.50k £12.86k £8.80k £12.75k
Income - Other £0 £5.53k £6.26k £195.34k £77.29k
Income - Legacies £216.69k £1.45m £543.76k £788.16k £461.32k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.22m £3.27m £3.57m £3.81m £4.35m
Expenditure - Raising funds £891.11k £895.37k £794.66k £702.97k £809.77k
Expenditure - Governance £22.41k £34.31k £35.21k £33.14k £33.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £2.82k £0 £1.64k £3.96k £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0