Trustees DEVON WILDLIFE TRUST
Charity number: 213224
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charlotte Anne Brereton Grezo | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Fiona Fileman-Wright | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ama Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Sara Jane Papworth | Trustee | 01 April 2021 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Margaret Bower | Trustee | 01 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Vice Admiral Andrew Paul Burns OBE | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Victoria Denise Pope | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Rebecca Anna Broad | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
GAIL MCKENZIE | Trustee | 10 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael Edward Moser | Trustee | 08 November 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.