LEPRA

Charity number: 213251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £5.00m £5.27m £4.66m £5.31m £5.80m
Total expenditure £5.41m £5.52m £4.89m £4.65m £4.57m
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £239.80k £172.45k £194.30k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.96m £3.17m £2.99m £3.53m £3.09m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.98m £2.05m £1.58m £1.70m £2.54m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £58.62k £57.44k £76.26k £68.57k £31.90k
Income - Other £5.89k £0 £14.98k £20.53k £137.74k
Income - Legacies £787.41k £1.10m £866.45k £1.69m £1.22m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £4.67m £4.83m £4.27m £4.03m £4.17m
Expenditure - Raising funds £738.16k £687.84k £619.51k £617.77k £398.72k
Expenditure - Governance £26.16k £23.89k £24.22k £0 £19.89k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0