LEPRA

Charity number: 213251
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katie Bigmore Trustee 09 May 2017 None on record
Natalia Bucci Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
PROFESSOR RODERICK HAY Trustee 10 May 2016
FUNGAL INFECTION TRUST Received: On time
Nayan Patel Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Dr Vishwa Mohan Katoch Trustee 23 February 2021 None on record
PROFESSOR DIANA NANCY JOHANNA LOCKWOOD Trustee 18 March 2014
THE HOSPITAL AND HOMES OF ST GILES Received: On time
Sampa Bhasin Trustee 04 December 2018 None on record
MEHMOOD KHAN Trustee 25 September 2018 None on record
Suzanne Joyce McCarthy Chair 29 September 2020 None on record
SUNIL THAPAR Trustee 08 October 2014 None on record
DINESH DHAMIJA Trustee 06 February 2018 None on record
MR SRI SHARMA Trustee 08 December 2014 None on record