NEWSQUEST STAFF BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raising money through events to distribute as one off gifts to past and present employees who encounter special financial difficulties.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Oxfordshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 06 December 1962: Standard registration
- 05 September 2017: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
- THE SIR CHARLES STARMER MEMORIAL BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114 | £250 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £919 | £915 | £915 | £1.59k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 19 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 15 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 24 March 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18TH SEPTEMBER, 1936 AS AMENDED 20TH FEBRUARY, 1947 AND 31ST DECEMBER, 2006
Charitable objects
GRANTS TO PERSONS WHO HAVE FOR A PERIOD OF 12 MONTHS MONTHS BEEN EMPLOYEES OF GANNETT UK LIMITED OR ANY OF THEIR SUBSIDIARY COMPANIES IN CONNECTION WITH ANY OF THE NEWSPAPERS OR PRINTING BUSINESSES CONTROLLED BY THEM OR THEIR SUBSIDIARIES OR PERSONS WHO HAVING BEEN SUCH EMPLOYEES HAVE RETIRED OWING TO AGE OR ILL HEALTH OR THE WIFE OR CHILD OF ANY SUCH EMPLOYEE OR PAST EMPLOYEE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window