THE CAVALRY AND GUARDS CLUB CHARITABLE FUND

Charity number: 213263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To afford relief in cases of distress or poverty as may arise among both current and retired members of staff or their dependants which commend themselves to the Trustees.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £3,591
Total expenditure: £5,225

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of Westminster

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE CAVALRY CLUB CHARITABLE FUND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Jane Rutherford-Jones Trustee 07 April 2023
None on record
MAJOR GENERAL ROBIN VINCENT SEARBY CB Trustee 11 January 2022
None on record
Major William Peto Trustee 18 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £3.50k £2.92k £3.50k £19.70k £3.59k
Total expenditure £14.33k £6.89k £20.25k £11.27k £5.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 18 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 17 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 11 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
THE CAVALRY & GUARDS CLUB
127 PICCADILLY
LONDON
W1J 7PX
Phone:
01714991261
Website:

No information available