MABE VILLAGE HALL AND WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 213438
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2020 28 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2018 08 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2017 04 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 01 August 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 Not Required