Trustees WILLIAM ADLINGTON CADBURY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 213629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SOPHY JULIET BLANDY Chair 16 December 2002
None on record
VICTORIA EMMELINE MOHAN Trustee 29 November 2012
None on record
JANINE EMMA COBAIN Trustee 19 March 2007
None on record
ADRIAN DAVID MILLS THOMAS Trustee 29 November 1994
None on record
JOHN CORNELIUS PENNY Trustee 29 November 1994
None on record
MARGARET SALMON Trustee 15 November 1988
MOUNT PLEASANT SCHOOL FARM
Received: On time
THE WORGAN TRUST
Received: On time
KATHERINE MARY VAN HAGEN CADBURY Trustee 09 December 1986
None on record
RUPERT ADLINGTON CADBURY Trustee 31 December 1979
TANSOR VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
THE OAKDALE TRUST
Received: On time
SARAH STAFFORD Trustee 08 November 1972
None on record