FAITH IN FAMILIES

Charity number: 213692
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £1.52m £1.06m £983.42k £1.01m £988.61k
Total expenditure £1.65m £1.52m £1.39m £1.46m £1.37m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £71.05k £25.63k £61.36k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £170.41k £79.39k £99.69k £97.49k £69.70k
Income - Other trading activities £6.45k £64 £252 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.31m £953.80k £855.03k £886.13k £892.46k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £41.05k £30.22k £28.45k £25.04k £26.45k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £65.00k £1.01k £29.84k £28.49k £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.71m £1.43m £1.27m £1.34m £1.30m
Expenditure - Raising funds £102.83k £91.46k £114.92k £121.17k £75.46k
Expenditure - Governance £22.47k £25.38k £21.27k £22.09k £20.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £57.72k £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £9.26k £9.26k £5.53k £3.66k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0